+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted version: Senate engrossed version
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:39 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2