+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Res)
- Amendment failed: Jackson flr amend (ref Res)
- Amendment failed: Landrum Taylor flr amend (ref Res)
- Amendment failed: Lopez flr amend (ref Res)
- Amendment failed: Schapira flr amend (ref Res)
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-1 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
February 28, 2011: Commerce and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor