+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading on reconsideration
- Senator linda gray motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass scr 1059 on third reading on march 25, 2010. motion carried.
- Motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Third read: Failed
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gray L #1 flr amend (ref PSHS)
- Amendment adopted: Gray L #2 flr amend (ref PSHS)
- Amendment adopted: Gray L #3 flr amend (ref PSHS)
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray L #3 flr amend (ref PSHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray L #1 flr amend (ref PSHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray L #2 flr amend (ref PSHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2010: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor