+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ENR
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Energy and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Energy and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Energy and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Energy and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
4-12 ce_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
5-10 ce_astransmitted
Senate Fact Sheet
2-6 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 12, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
February 21, 2012: Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
January 31, 2012: Commerce and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1