+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:39 pm
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1