+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-6 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
2-10 gr_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 30, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor