+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref Res)
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Shooter flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-28 gr_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 31, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor