+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Resolution) adopted
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Resolution) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 6
March 1, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor