+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment: Harper motion to overturn ruling of the chair on germainess of Harper flr am failed s/v 16-25
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 am
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 26, 2012: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor