+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
June 10, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1