+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 14 15 1 0 failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator antenori motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass scr 1029 on third reading on march 5, 2012. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading on reconsideration
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 amobject
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2012: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor