+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
- Referred to House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:28PM.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 26, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
March 6, 2017: House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 1, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor