+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:34PM.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:28PM.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2017: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
February 1, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor