+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Antenori flr amend (ref Res)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Res)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 31, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor