+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
6-15 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
June 23, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor