+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yarbrough flr amend (ref Res)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-8 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
2-24 fin_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 8
March 2, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 23, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor