+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-26 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
Government Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2010: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 20, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1