+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass
- House second read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pmobject
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-6 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
March 13, 2014: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
February 6, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1