+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Leach flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:29PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 28, 2020: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor