+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmitted version: Senate engrossed version
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pmobject
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-3 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 26, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor