+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-4 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 25, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor