+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:29PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
February 5, 2020: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 8