+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Res)
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3