+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:20PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 28, 2020: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor