+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-7 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 24, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor