+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 15 15 0 0 failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator barto motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass scr 1016 on third reading on march 10, 2011. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading on reconsideration
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pmobject
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 17
January 24, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor