+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Final disposition: Retained on committee of whole calendar
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- State Debt and Budget Reform: Do pass amended
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: State Debt and Budget Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
State Debt and Budget Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
State Debt and Budget Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
February 2, 2015: State Debt and Budget Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor