+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:39 pm
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pm
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 15, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2012: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor