+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:30 pm
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: VMA (ref Bill)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2011: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2011: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor