+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: BSFSS (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass amended
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-20 bsfss
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2012: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
January 11, 2012: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor