+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
- Third read: Failed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gorman flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Gorman Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gorman Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 22, 2009: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor