+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
March 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 16, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor