+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:53PM.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:06PM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 19, 2018: House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 1, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 11, 2018: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor