+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 15 14 1 0 y failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref Resolution)
- Third read: Failed
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator yarbrough motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass scr 1003 on third reading on march 12, 2014. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading on reconsideration
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pmobject
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Elections: Do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Elections
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Crandell flr amend (ref Resolution) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-13 elec_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
Crandell flr amend (ref Resolution) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2014: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2014: Elections: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor