+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: FAILED
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Rep. Toma motioned that the House suspend Rules 8(K), 32 and 36 and Senate Concurrent Resolution 1003 be placed on the active calendar for Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v.: PASSED
- Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
June 30, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 15
June 25, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 25
March 16, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
March 16, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 10, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 12, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor