+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House second read
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Do pass and proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 5:30 pm
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
March 22, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 21, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 10, 2011: Rules: Do pass and proper for consideration (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor