+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Farnsworth
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House second read
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Do pass and proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 5:30 pm
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to the Judiciary Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to the Judiciary Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
4-21 jud_astransmitted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
March 23, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 22, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 21, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 10, 2011: Rules: Do pass and proper for consideration (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor