+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Brophy McGee flr amend (ref Resolution) adopted
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 15, 2019: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3