+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Vote
February 3, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor