+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Water and Energy Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Water and Energy Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (10)
April 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 22
March 2, 2016: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 2, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2016: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2016: Water and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 3, 2016: Senate Water and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor