+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Environment: Discussed and held
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 amobject
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-6 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
January 31, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1