+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pmobject
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-18 hhs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2014: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
February 17, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1