+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House State & International Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
February 11, 2020: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor