+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-16 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor