+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Con Mem - Chabin
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pmobject
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-30 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 24, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 9
February 21, 2012: Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 26, 2012: Commerce and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2