+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:39 pm
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pm
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-30 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
February 20, 2012: Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor