+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:59PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Federal Relations Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federal Relations Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee: do pass.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 14, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
February 26, 2019: House Federal Relations Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 14, 2019: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor