+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1841 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried.: PASSED
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 25
June 24, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor