+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Fann flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 3, 2021: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor