+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Senate concurred.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Biasiucci - passed
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:25PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Rios flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
June 28, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
March 3, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
March 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 3, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor